Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget and Management, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103
Title
Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 /CH0214
Title
Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127 /CH0384
Title
Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 (SB0449)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0625)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Task Force to Study Federal Funding in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0415
Title
Coast Smart Council
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700 (SB0252)
Title
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008 (SB0767)
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025 /CH0633
Title
State Personnel - Contractual Employees - Filling of Vacant Positions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1040 /CH0440 (SB0879)
Title
State Personnel - Disciplinary Appeal and Grievance Procedure Documents - Electronic Transmission
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224 (SB0989)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate DeBoy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0927)
Title
Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180
Title
State Personnel - Child Day Care Financial Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0700)
Title
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Public Hearings on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0554)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB1008)
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879 (HB1040/CH0440)
Title
State Personnel - Disciplinary Appeal and Grievance Procedure Documents - Electronic Transmission
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1323)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0989 (HB1224)
Title
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0103 Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0104 /CH0214 Department of Budget and Management - Budget Analysts - Qualifications Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Appropriations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 /CH0384 Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax Refunds Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 384
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
HB0166 (SB0449) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0554 (SB0625) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0560 Task Force to Study Federal Funding in Maryland Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 /CH0415 Coast Smart Council Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 (SB0252) Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 (SB0767) Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 /CH0633 State Personnel - Contractual Employees - Filling of Vacant Positions Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1040 /CH0440 (SB0879) State Personnel - Disciplinary Appeal and Grievance Procedure Documents - Electronic Transmission Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 (SB0989) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Delegate DeBoy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1323 (SB0927) Public School Construction - Creative Financing Study Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0180 State Personnel - Child Day Care Financial Assistance Program Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 (HB0700) Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Public Hearings on Workplace Bullying in State Agencies Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0625 (HB0554) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0767 (HB1008) Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0879 (HB1040/CH0440) State Personnel - Disciplinary Appeal and Grievance Procedure Documents - Electronic Transmission Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1323) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0989 (HB1224) State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Sworn Police Officers - Binding Arbitration Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM