Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget and Management, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 (SB0073)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0435
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB0657)
Title
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0687)
Title
State Personnel - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 /CH0291 (SB0334)
Title
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022 (SB0609)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0228)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0221)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 (HB1193)
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 (HB0965/CH0291)
Title
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 (HB0702)
Title
State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 (HB0776)
Title
State Personnel - Parental Leave
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0199
Title
State Personnel - Automatic Step Increases - Standard Pay Plan
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893
Title
Commission on Free Trade, Currency Manipulation, and State Sovereignty - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0221 (SB0073) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 /CH0435 State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 (SB0657) State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0776 (SB0687) State Personnel - Parental Leave Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 /CH0291 (SB0334) The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015 Delegate Haynes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1022 (SB0609) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Establishment Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 (SB0228) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 (HB0221) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 (HB1193) Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 (HB0965/CH0291) The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015 Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 (HB0702) State Personnel - Programs to Improve Employee to Supervisor or Manager Ratios Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0687 (HB0776) State Personnel - Parental Leave Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0793 /CH0199 State Personnel - Automatic Step Increases - Standard Pay Plan Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0854 State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0893 Commission on Free Trade, Currency Manipulation, and State Sovereignty - Establishment Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM