Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0018)
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0626
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0631
Title
Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of Violations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 /CH0537 (SB0750/CH0536)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0410 (SB0902)
Title
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 (SB1042)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 (HB0469)
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0536 (HB0769/CH0537)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris Standards
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1279/CH0410)
Title
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1511)
Title
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0469 (SB0018) Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0637 /CH0626 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0631 Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of Violations Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 /CH0537 (SB0750/CH0536) Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1279 /CH0410 (SB0902) Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1511 (SB1042) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0018 (HB0469) Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0028 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 /CH0536 (HB0769/CH0537) Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris Standards Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1279/CH0410) Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB1042 (HB1511) Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - Decisions Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM