Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0211)
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0239 (SB0262)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0638)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Poisoning - Portable Generators
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0169)
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 (HB0323/CH0239)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0800)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 (SB0211) State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 /CH0239 (SB0262) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes Delegate Impallaria 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0638) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0825 Public Safety - Carbon Monoxide Poisoning - Portable Generators Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1210 Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of Modifications Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1264 Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0197 Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0211 (HB0169) State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 (HB0323/CH0239) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy Codes Senator Jennings 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0638 (HB0800) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement Washington County Senators 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM