Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110
Title
Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0734)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0153
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Targets (Clean Buildings Jobs Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 (HB0111)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 Baltimore County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Notice - Lead Registry and Code Compliance - Pilot Program Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0111 (SB0734) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0153 Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1490 Environment - Building Energy Performance Standards and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Targets (Clean Buildings Jobs Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0734 (HB0111) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 2:19 PM