Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0330)
Title
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0469)
Title
State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0469 (SB0330) State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0570 Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0330 (HB0469) State-Funded Construction and Major Renovation Projects - Solar Panels - Requirement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0940 Public Safety - Fire Prevention Codes and Maryland Building Performance Standards - Solar Energy Generating Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/10/2021 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page