Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Building Permits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423
Title
St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0139
Title
Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0524/CH0492)
Title
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0907)
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 /CH0492 (HB0800)
Title
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0953)
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0423 St. Mary's County - Building Impact Fees St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0766 /CH0139 Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0524/CH0492) Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0953 (SB0907) Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0524 /CH0492 (HB0800) Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0953) Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page