Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Permits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 /CH0351
Title
Prince George’s County – School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges – Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 415–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0071 (HB0639/CH0070)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 /CH0351 Prince George’s County – School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges – Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 415–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation Delegate Glenn 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0826 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0071 (HB0639/CH0070) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM