Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Burglary

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0861)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940 (SB0248)
Title
Criminal Law - Home Invasion Violent Crime and Armed Home Invasion Violent Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0985 (SB0722)
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0940)
Title
Criminal Law - Home Invasion Violent Crime and Armed Home Invasion Violent Crime
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB0985)
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0478)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0477 Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0861) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0940 (SB0248) Criminal Law - Home Invasion Violent Crime and Armed Home Invasion Violent Crime Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0985 (SB0722) Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0248 (HB0940) Criminal Law - Home Invasion Violent Crime and Armed Home Invasion Violent Crime Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB0985) Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0478) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM