Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Burglary

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 (SB0238)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property (Stand Your Ground Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215
Title
Criminal Law – Crimes Against Property – Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 (SB0238) Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1214 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property (Stand Your Ground Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 Criminal Law – Crimes Against Property – Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM