Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Burglary

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 (SB0848)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308 (SB0919)
Title
Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine)
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB1209)
Title
Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1308)
Title
Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951
Title
Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0126 (SB0206/CH0127) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 126
Judiciary
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0459 Criminal Law - Victims of Human Trafficking - Affirmative Defense Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1209 (SB0848) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 (SB0919) Criminal Law – Felony First–Degree Murder – Limitation and Review of Conviction Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1338 Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0127 (HB0242/CH0126) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020) Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0509 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine) Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0848 (HB1209) Public Safety - DNA Collection, Records, Analysis, and Reporting Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1308) Criminal Law - Task Force to Study Felony Murder Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0951 Criminal Law - Felony First-Degree Murder - Limitation and Resentencing Procedure Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:28 PM