Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Buses -see also- School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842
Title
Public Safety - Drug Treatment Court - Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057 /CH0442
Title
Prince George's County - University of Maryland, College Park Bus Service - Motor Carrier Permit Exemption - Removal of Sunset PG 403-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 /CH0006
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0013
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0619 Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 Public Safety - Drug Treatment Court - Baltimore City Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1057 /CH0442 Prince George's County - University of Maryland, College Park Bus Service - Motor Carrier Permit Exemption - Removal of Sunset PG 403-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 /CH0006 Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0013 Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM