Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Buses -see also- School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 /CH0340
Title
Maryland Transit Administration and Baltimore City Department of Transportation – Study of Dedicated Bus Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 (SB0319/CH0420)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Coordination of Public Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0702)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0139
Title
Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229
Title
Baltimore City - Summer Youth Employment - Funding and Incentives
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 /CH0420 (HB0201)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB1235)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 /CH0340 Maryland Transit Administration and Baltimore City Department of Transportation – Study of Dedicated Bus Lanes Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0201 (SB0319/CH0420) Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees) Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0763 Maryland Transit Administration - Coordination of Public Transportation Network Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 (SB0702) Healthy Climate Initiative Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1412 Transportation – Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act – Alterations Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0139 Vehicle Laws – HOV Lanes – Hybrid Vehicles Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 Baltimore City - Summer Youth Employment - Funding and Incentives Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0319 /CH0420 (HB0201) Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees) Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB1235) Healthy Climate Initiative Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0837 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM