Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Buses -see also- School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 (SB0548)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0423)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0668)
Title
Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406
Title
Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 (SB0926)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526
Title
Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 (HB0432)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0390)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668 (HB0876)
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1425)
Title
Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0390 (SB0548) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0432 (SB0423) Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0876 (SB0668) Transportation - Purple Line Marketing Program (Purple Line Marketing Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 Land Use – Comprehensive Plan – Middle Housing (Planning for Modest Homes Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1425 (SB0926) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1492 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1526 Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0423 (HB0432) Maryland Transit Administration - Conversion to Electric Buses (Electric Bus Transition Act) Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0548 (HB0390) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0668 (HB0876) Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0926 (HB1425) Climate Solutions Act of 2020 – Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 2:20 PM