Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Business and Economic Development, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 (SB1051)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 /CH0613
Title
State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0571 (SB0889/CH0570)
Title
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086
Title
State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure Act
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Procurement - Real Estate Development Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0921)
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262 (SB0633)
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324
Title
Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146
Title
Business and Economic Development - Foreign Trade Zones - Information
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0525
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB1262)
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 /CH0570 (HB1060/CH0571)
Title
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 (HB1251)
Title
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1051 (HB0520)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0520 (SB1051) Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0742 /CH0531 (SB0600/CH0530) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0765 /CH0613 State Personnel - Authority to Set Compensation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 /CH0571 (SB0889/CH0570) Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority Delegate James 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1086 State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure Act Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1220 Procurement - Real Estate Development Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Participation Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1251 (SB0921) Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Reassigned to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1262 (SB0633) Maryland Education Credit Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1324 Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014 Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 Business and Economic Development - Foreign Trade Zones - Information Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 /CH0525 Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0633 (HB1262) Maryland Education Credit Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0735 Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0889 /CH0570 (HB1060/CH0571) Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0921 (HB1251) Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and Trust Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2014 - 8:30 AM
Finance
SB1051 (HB0520) Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Program Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM