Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Business Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434 (SB0693)
Title
Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0395)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Income Tax Credit - Pass-Through Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB1298)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0434)
Title
Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Nonpassive Income of a Pass-Through Entity
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0434 (SB0693) Personal Property Tax Reports - Electronic Filing Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 (SB0395) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Income Tax Credit - Pass-Through Entities Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0395 (HB1298) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0693 (HB0434) Personal Property Tax Returns - Electronic Filing Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Nonpassive Income of a Pass-Through Entity Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM