Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Business Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0612)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0583)
Title
Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 (HB1290)
Title
Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0709)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Economic Matters
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0204 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 (SB0612) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 (SB0583) Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0409 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 (HB1290) Income Tax - Affordable Housing Credit Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0612 (HB0709) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM