Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Business Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129
Title
Taxes - Election for Pass-Through Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338 (SB0276)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0216)
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0292 (SB0469/CH0293)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404
Title
Public Ethics – Financial Disclosure – Requirements (Conflicts of Interest Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1567 (SB0715)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 /CH0529
Title
Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 (HB0439)
Title
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB0338)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 /CH0293 (HB0668/CH0292)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 /CH0641
Title
Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities and Corporations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 (HB1567)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0129 Taxes - Election for Pass-Through Entities Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 (SB0276) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Appropriations
HB0439 (SB0216) Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Additional Tax Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0668 /CH0292 (SB0469/CH0293) Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 292
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1404 Public Ethics – Financial Disclosure – Requirements (Conflicts of Interest Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1567 (SB0715) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0115 /CH0529 Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 529
Budget and Taxation
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0216 (HB0439) Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional Tax Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 (HB0338) Building Opportunity Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 /CH0293 (HB0668/CH0292) Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 293
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0523 /CH0641 Income Tax – Pass–Through Entities and Corporations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 641
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0715 (HB1567) Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing Development Credit Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:38 PM