Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 (SB0578)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0910)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 (SB0469)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278
Title
Corporations and Associations - "Crowdfunding" Laws - Restrictions and Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 (HB1246)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0882)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder Preference
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 (HB1021)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0881 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 (SB0578) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 (SB0910) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1246 (SB0469) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013 Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1278 Corporations and Associations - "Crowdfunding" Laws - Restrictions and Compliance Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 Solar Energy Grant Program - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/30/2013 - 2:45 PM
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 (HB1246) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0882) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0772 Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder Preference Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 (HB1021) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM