Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840 (SB0347)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0551 (SB0713/CH0550)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0395)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308
Title
Limited Liability Companies - Fees - Young Adult-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0840)
Title
Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB1298)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 /CH0550 (HB0916/CH0551)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809
Title
Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840
Title
Corporations - Members of Boards of Directors - Demographic Information - Report to Board of Public Works
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978
Title
Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and Liability
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0268 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 (SB0347) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0551 (SB0713/CH0550) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1298 (SB0395) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1308 Limited Liability Companies - Fees - Young Adult-Owned Businesses Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Delegate Swain 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1365 Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0005 Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0840) Religious Corporations - Laws Governing Assets of United Methodist Church - Repeal Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0395 (HB1298) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0713 /CH0550 (HB0916/CH0551) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0809 Citizens' United Shareholder Democracy and Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0840 Corporations - Members of Boards of Directors - Demographic Information - Report to Board of Public Works Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0978 Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and Liability Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM