Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0521 (SB0459)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0256 (SB0681)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 (SB0179)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Corporation Act - Delinquency Period for Purpose of Eviction Action
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 (SB0153)
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0885)
Title
Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179 (HB0663)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 (HB0521)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB0522/CH0256)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and Liability
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0351 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0521 (SB0459) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0522 /CH0256 (SB0681) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0576 Maryland Local Stock Market and Social Stock Exchange Task Force Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0663 (SB0179) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0741 Maryland Cooperative Housing Corporation Act - Delinquency Period for Purpose of Eviction Action Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 (SB0153) Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0885) Corporations - Political Expenditures - Stockholder Approval Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 (HB0663) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 (HB0521) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity from Liability Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB0522/CH0256) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0908 Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and Liability Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM