Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215
Title
County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Corporate Bylaws and Elections of Directors and Trustees
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 (SB0357)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0691
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 (SB0656)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759 /CH0358 (SB0398/CH0359)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 (SB0971)
Title
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
Corporations and Associations - Domestications - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1260
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 (HB0615)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0359 (HB0759/CH0358)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0714)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837)
Title
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB0919)
Title
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0215 County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0268 Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - Exemption Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0589 Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Corporate Bylaws and Elections of Directors and Trustees Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 (SB0357) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0691 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0714 (SB0656) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - Repeal Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0759 /CH0358 (SB0398/CH0359) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0859 Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0919 (SB0971) Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1149 /CH0837 (SB0951/CH0838) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Delegate Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1184 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Fees Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1249 Corporations and Associations - Domestications - Authorization Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1260 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1641 Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative Advocacy Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0357 (HB0615) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0398 /CH0359 (HB0759/CH0358) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0656 (HB0714) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0951 /CH0838 (HB1149/CH0837) Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable Adults Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0971 (HB0919) Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM