Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 (SB0724)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026 /CH0266
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 /CH0288
Title
Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0289
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB0414)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
HB0414 (SB0724) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0900 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 /CH0266 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Expedited Document Processing Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0136 /CH0288 Corporations - Corporate Records and Electronic Transmission Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0289 Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0724 (HB0414) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM