Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Insurance - Other than Health (C4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0168 (SB0552)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0149)
Title
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0458)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 (SB0580)
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 (HB0457)
Title
Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272
Title
Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372
Title
Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458 (HB0504)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0168)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0641)
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1251)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0168 (SB0552) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0221 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0303 Long-Term Care Insurance - Prohibition on Premium Increases (Long Term Stability for Seniors Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
HB0457 (SB0149) Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Reassigned to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0504 (SB0458) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 11:00 a.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
HB0641 (SB0580) Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1251 (SB0805) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1275 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1305 Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0110 Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notices - Alteration of Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0120 Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0149 (HB0457) Insurance - Application of Premium Tax - Continued Exclusion of Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0226 Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0272 Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0411 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 (HB0504) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 (HB0168) Motor Vehicle Insurance Use of Credit History Rating Policy Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0641) Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB1251) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 10:50 AM
Click to return on the top page