Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988 /CH0434 (SB0527)
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB1080)
Title
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 (HB0988/CH0434)
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026
Title
Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 (HB1426)
Title
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0988 /CH0434 (SB0527) Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 (SB1080) Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 (HB0988/CH0434) Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1026 Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB1080 (HB1426) Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page