Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 /CH0496
Title
Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 /CH0727
Title
The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0704 Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 /CH0496 Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing Requirements Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 /CH0727 The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016 Delegate Walker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM