Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0130 /CH0767 (SB0032)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0392 /CH0333 (SB0381/CH0334)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421 (SB0463)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0489
Title
Study Group on Building a Supertrack and Performance Center in Baltimore County
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177 /CH0521 (SB1115/CH0522)
Title
Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442
Title
Horse Racing License – Land Preservation Trust – Shawan Downs
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1592 /CH0221 (SB0851/CH0222)
Title
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1721 /CH0184 (SB1158/CH0185)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0130/CH0767)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 /CH0334 (HB0392/CH0333)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0421)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762
Title
Horse Racing License - Land Preservation Trust - Shawan Downs
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0222 (HB1592/CH0221)
Title
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1115 /CH0522 (HB1177/CH0521)
Title
Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 /CH0185 (HB1721/CH0184)
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0130 /CH0767 (SB0032) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 767
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0392 /CH0333 (SB0381/CH0334) Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0421 (SB0463) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0489 Study Group on Building a Supertrack and Performance Center in Baltimore County Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 /CH0521 (SB1115/CH0522) Horse Racing – Interstate Compact on Anti–Doping and Drug Testing Standards Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1442 Horse Racing License – Land Preservation Trust – Shawan Downs Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1592 /CH0221 (SB0851/CH0222) Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and Membership Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1721 /CH0184 (SB1158/CH0185) Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0032 (HB0130/CH0767) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 /CH0334 (HB0392/CH0333) Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Loss Assistance Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 (HB0421) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0762 Horse Racing License - Land Preservation Trust - Shawan Downs Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0851 /CH0222 (HB1592/CH0221) Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and Membership Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1115 /CH0522 (HB1177/CH0521) Horse Racing - Interstate Compact on Anti-Doping and Drug Testing Standards Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1158 /CH0185 (HB1721/CH0184) Horse Racing - Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentives - Modifications Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM