Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Horse Racing (C6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0562)
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0673)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0883)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070 (SB0878)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0800)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0458)
Title
Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0643)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds – Racetrack Facility Renewal Account – Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1190)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB1070)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0990)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 (SB0562) Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0643 (SB0673) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Rosapepe)
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0990 (SB0883) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1070 (SB0878) Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 (SB0800) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup Delegate Glenn 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal Cecil County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0458) Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0673 (HB0643) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds – Racetrack Facility Renewal Account – Racecourse at Timonium Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1190) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0878 (HB1070) Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB0990) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM