Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cable Television

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Cable Television - Equipment Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0434 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0502 Cable Television - Equipment Rentals Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0572 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
HB1415 Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - Enforcement Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM