Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cable Television

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 (SB1001)
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1330 (SB0877)
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1330)
Title
Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 (HB0932)
Title
21st–Century Economy Fairness Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0932 (SB1001) 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0940 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1330 (SB0877) Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1330) Underground Facilities Damage Prevention - Revision Senator Feldman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1001 (HB0932) 21st–Century Economy Fairness Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 4:03 PM