Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Campaign Financing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259
Title
Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0673)
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
General Assembly - Members - Constituent Services Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Campaign Finance - Contributions - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044 (SB0584)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583
Title
Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB1044)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0493)
Title
Referendum Integrity Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder Preference
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056
Title
Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0259 Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of Contributions Delegate Bobo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses Delegate Howard 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 (SB0673) Referendum Integrity Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 General Assembly - Members - Constituent Services Fund Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0620 Campaign Finance - Contributions - Disclosure Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1044 (SB0584) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0583 Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 (HB1044) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0673 (HB0493) Referendum Integrity Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder Preference Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1056 Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM