Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Campaign Financing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 /CH0252
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156
Title
Election Law - Campaign Material - Clarification of Definition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0174
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic Mail
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 /CH0203 (SB0408/CH0202)
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297
Title
Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0578 (SB0002)
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Disbursements by Debit and Credit Cards
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963 /CH0725 (SB0459/CH0726)
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Political Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248 (SB0428)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0002)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 (HB0578)
Title
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290
Title
Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 /CH0202 (HB0241/CH0203)
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB1248)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0459 /CH0726 (HB0963/CH0725)
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Shareholders United Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0973
Title
Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Solicitation of Contributions or Donations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002 (HJ0008)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0112 /CH0252 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions Received Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0156 Election Law - Campaign Material - Clarification of Definition Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0174 Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic Mail Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 /CH0203 (SB0408/CH0202) Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0297 Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - Prohibition Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0578 (SB0002) Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016 Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Disbursements by Debit and Credit Cards Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0963 /CH0725 (SB0459/CH0726) Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1164 Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial Office Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Political Activity Delegate Turner 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1248 (SB0428) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0002) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 (HB0578) Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0290 Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0408 /CH0202 (HB0241/CH0203) Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Nationals Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB1248) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0459 /CH0726 (HB0963/CH0725) Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Shareholders United Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0973 Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Solicitation of Contributions or Donations Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (85-52)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0002 (HJ0008) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM