Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Campaign Financing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234
Title
Campaign Finance - Making a Contribution During General Assembly Session - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation Disclosures
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303 (SB0854)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0786
Title
Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551
Title
Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898 /CH0852
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976 (SB0550)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363
Title
Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 /CH0851
Title
Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0282
Title
Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259
Title
Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB0976)
Title
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 (HB0303)
Title
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0234 Campaign Finance - Making a Contribution During General Assembly Session - Prohibition Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0299 Campaign Finance - Political Action Committees - Solicitation Disclosures Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0303 (SB0854) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0376 Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - Prohibition Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0786 Election Law - Political Parties, Candidacy, and Campaign Finance Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 786
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0551 Election Law - Private Loan to Campaign Finance Entity of Candidate - Prohibited Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 /CH0852 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated Expenditures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 (SB0550) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1363 Maryland Small Donor Incentive Act Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1498 /CH0851 Campaign Finance - Political Organizations - Compliance and Disclosure Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 851
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0006 (SJ0004) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 /CH0282 Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign Principals Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0259 Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance Entity Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB0976) Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County Council Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0832 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 (HB0303) Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour Activities Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SJ0004 (HJ0006) United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy Amendment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM