Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Camps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126 (SB0827)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Restoration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642)
Title
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB1126)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Restoration Project
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Septic System
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0642 (SB0508/CH0180) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1126 (SB0827) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Restoration Project Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 /CH0180 (HB0642) Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and Subcontractors Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB1126) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Restoration Project Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0857 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Septic System Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 4:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page