Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Camps

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0334 (SB0046/CH0333)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516 /CH0269
Title
Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 /CH0333 (HB0321/CH0334)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0321 /CH0334 (SB0046/CH0333) Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0516 /CH0269 Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Glass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 /CH0333 (HB0321/CH0334) Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM