Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Cannabis Production -see also- Cannabis, Cannabis Dist.

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0345 (SB0347/CH0346)
Title
Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 /CH0352
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Compassionate Use Fund – Revisions (The Fakiza Rahman Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1068
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensaries and Medical Cannabis Laboratory Advisory Council
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1210 (SB0146)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317 (SB0953)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0821)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1449 (SB1012)
Title
Health - Medical Cannabis Reauthorization Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1568 (SB0943)
Title
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1630
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Education Programs and Research Projects - Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 (HB1210)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 /CH0346 (HB0857/CH0345)
Title
Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1369)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensaries and Medical Cannabis Laboratory Advisory Council
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953 (HB1317)
Title
Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1012 (HB1449)
Title
Health - Medical Cannabis Reauthorization Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1031
Title
Medical Cannabis - Grower, Dispensary, and Processor Agents - Age Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035
Title
Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1075
Title
Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0857 /CH0345 (SB0347/CH0346) Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 345
Judiciary
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0870 /CH0352 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Compassionate Use Fund – Revisions (The Fakiza Rahman Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 352
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB1068 Medical Cannabis - Dispensaries and Medical Cannabis Laboratory Advisory Council Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1210 (SB0146) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1317 (SB0953) Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 (SB0821) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1449 (SB1012) Health - Medical Cannabis Reauthorization Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1568 (SB0943) Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety (Safe Care Act) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1630 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Education Programs and Research Projects - Licenses Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0146 (HB1210) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 /CH0346 (HB0857/CH0345) Public Safety - Certification of Police Officers Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 346
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0821 (HB1369) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0916 Medical Cannabis - Dispensaries and Medical Cannabis Laboratory Advisory Council Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0953 (HB1317) Medical Cannabis - Dispensary Grower-Processor License Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1012 (HB1449) Health - Medical Cannabis Reauthorization Act Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1031 Medical Cannabis - Grower, Dispensary, and Processor Agents - Age Requirement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1035 Hemp Farming Program - Expansion - Processing Hemp Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1075 Adult-Use Cannabis - Legalization Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:16 PM