Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 /CH0495 (SB0056)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0268)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0867)
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 (HB0071/CH0495)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0268 (HB0210)
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB0597)
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 /CH0495 (SB0056) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495;Item ZA00(I) - Maryland Hall for the Creative Arts - Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2016
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0210 (SB0268) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0597 (SB0867) Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 (HB0071/CH0495) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
SB0268 (HB0210) Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 (HB0597) Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM