Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0457)
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 (SB0191/CH0027)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 (SB0324/CH0013)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0949 (SB0897)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Budget Approval PG/MC 104-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 /CH0027 (HB0151)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB0108)
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 (HB0949)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0457) Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0151 (SB0191/CH0027) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0309 (SB0324/CH0013) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Delegate Busch 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0949 (SB0897) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital Expenditures Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Budget Approval PG/MC 104-16 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0191 /CH0027 (HB0151) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015 President 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 (HB0108) Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Budget and Taxation
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0738 Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0897 (HB0949) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital Expenditures Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM