Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budgets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0186/CH0009)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0188)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017 - Public School Construction Program - Baltimore City Heating and Ventilation Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0597 (SB0417)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0438)
Title
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 /CH0009 (HB0162)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0170)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017 - Public School Construction Program - Baltimore City Heating and Ventilation Projects
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0597)
Title
Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0682)
Title
State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0162 (SB0186/CH0009) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0170 (SB0188) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017 - Public School Construction Program - Baltimore City Heating and Ventilation Projects Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0597 (SB0417) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0682 (SB0438) State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0186 /CH0009 (HB0162) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2018, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, 2016, and 2017 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0188 (HB0170) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017 - Public School Construction Program - Baltimore City Heating and Ventilation Projects Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0417 (HB0597) Commission on African American Patriots in the American Revolutionary War Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0438 (HB0682) State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM