Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caregivers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0456 (SB0857)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761 (SB0600/CH0452)
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212 /CH0077 (SB0024/CH0078)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Provider Applications - Medical Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077)
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0452 (HB0761)
Title
Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Correctional Services - Medical Cannabis - Medical Treatment for Inmates
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857 (HB0017/CH0456)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Edible Cannabis Products
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Immunity - Revocation of Release
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862
Title
Landlord-Tenant - Tenant Protections - Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864
Title
Contracts and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0456 (SB0857) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Processing and Dispensing Medical Cannabis Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0761 (SB0600/CH0452) Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services Delegate Patterson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0794 Labor and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition (Medical Cannabis Patient and Caregiver Antidiscrimination Act) Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/11/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 Estates and Trusts - Testamentary Instruments - Fraud and Undue Influence Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 /CH0077 (SB0024/CH0078) Family Law - Kinship Caregivers Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1359 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Provider Applications - Medical Conditions Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0024 /CH0078 (HB1212/CH0077) Family Law - Kinship Caregivers Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0452 (HB0761) Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 Correctional Services - Medical Cannabis - Medical Treatment for Inmates Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0857 (HB0017/CH0456) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Edible Cannabis Products Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0860 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Immunity - Revocation of Release Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 Landlord-Tenant - Tenant Protections - Medical Cannabis Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0864 Contracts and Employment - Discrimination Against Medical Cannabis Patients and Caregivers - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM