Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caregivers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0702)
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 (SB0969)
Title
Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Regulations, Staffing, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0821)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527 (SB0833)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0320)
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1369)
Title
Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB1527)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1063)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations, Staffing, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0320 (SB0702) Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1063 (SB0969) Health Care Facilities – Assisted Living Programs – Regulations, Staffing, and Training Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1369 (SB0821) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1527 (SB0833) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0320) Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0821 (HB1369) Cannabis - Medical Cannabis Boutique Grower License and Pesticides Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB1527) Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0969 (HB1063) Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations, Staffing, and Training Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/4/2020 7:01 PM