Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 /CH0192 (SB0148/CH0191)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 (SB0147)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 (HB0290)
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 /CH0191 (HB0162/CH0192)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 /CH0192 (SB0148/CH0191) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0290 (SB0147) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0147 (HB0290) Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 /CH0191 (HB0162/CH0192) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM