Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0839)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Benedictine School
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0038)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 (SB0083/CH0273)
Title
Caroline County and Talbot County - Annual Financial Report - Filing Date
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374 (SB0760)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Old Caroline High School Phase II
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 (HB0855)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0273 (HB0939)
Title
Caroline County and Talbot County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1374)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Old Caroline High School Phase II
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Greensboro Community Center
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0337
Title
Caroline County - Volunteer Fire Companies - Storage of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0768)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Benedictine School
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0768 (SB0839) Creation of a State Debt - Benedictine School Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB0855 (SB0038) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 (SB0083/CH0273) Caroline County and Talbot County - Annual Financial Report - Filing Date Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1374 (SB0760) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Old Caroline High School Phase II Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 (HB0855) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0273 (HB0939) Caroline County and Talbot County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0760 (HB1374) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Old Caroline High School Phase II Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0761 Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Greensboro Community Center Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0764 /CH0337 Caroline County - Volunteer Fire Companies - Storage of Alcoholic Beverages Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0768) Creation of a State Debt - Benedictine School Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM