Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Caroline County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0108 (SB0634)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 (SB1002)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Sharp Road Community Park
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219 (SB1118)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Pleasant Heritage Preservation Community Education Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Caroline County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 (HB0549/CH0108)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350)
Title
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1143)
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB0959)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Sharp Road Community Park
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1118 (HB1219)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Pleasant Heritage Preservation Community Education Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 Caroline County - Sunday Hunting Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 /CH0108 (SB0634) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0959 (SB1002) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Sharp Road Community Park Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 AM
HB1097 (SB0729) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1219 (SB1118) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Pleasant Heritage Preservation Community Education Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1350 (SB0707/CH0420) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1511 Caroline County - Deer Management Permit - Firearms Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0634 (HB0549/CH0108) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Caroline County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0707 /CH0420 (HB1350) Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and Definition Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0728 (HB1143) Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0729 (HB1097) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0738 Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB1002 (HB0959) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Sharp Road Community Park Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
SB1118 (HB1219) Creation of a State Debt - Caroline County - Mt. Pleasant Heritage Preservation Community Education Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM