Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0442)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0107)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513 (SB1002)
Title
County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0212)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0102)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB0513)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0442) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0107) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0513 (SB1002) County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
SB0107 (HB0212) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 (HB0102) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1002 (HB0513) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM