Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0469 (SB0429/CH0468)
Title
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307
Title
Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student Enrollment
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0430)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 /CH0467 (SB0428/CH0466)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0618
Title
Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 (SB0588/CH0063)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0396
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1533
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation Board
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH0466 (HB0319/CH0467)
Title
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0468 (HB0305/CH0469)
Title
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0310)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0588 /CH0063 (HB0846)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855
Title
Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0298 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Markets Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Beer Festival Licenses Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 /CH0469 (SB0429/CH0468) Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0307 Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student Enrollment Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 (SB0430) Carroll County - Gaming Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0319 /CH0467 (SB0428/CH0466) Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0618 Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 (SB0588/CH0063) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0396 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1533 Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation Board Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 /CH0466 (HB0319/CH0467) Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student Representative Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 /CH0468 (HB0305/CH0469) Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus Funds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0310) Carroll County - Gaming Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0588 /CH0063 (HB0846) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0848 Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - Prohibited Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM