Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 /CH0356 (SB0049)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Cecil and Queen Anne's Counties - Beer and Wine Festivals
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Boys & Girls Club of Cecil County Northeast Renovation Project
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charlestown - Cecil Inn Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 /CH0672 (SB1011)
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0795)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425
Title
Cecil County - Special Wine Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 /CH0253
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1244)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB1171/CH0672)
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0212 /CH0356 (SB0049) Alcoholic Beverages - Cecil and Queen Anne's Counties - Beer and Wine Festivals Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0705 Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Boys & Girls Club of Cecil County Northeast Renovation Project Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB1034 Creation of a State Debt - Charlestown - Cecil Inn Renovations Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB1171 /CH0672 (SB1011) Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1244 (SB0795) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1425 Cecil County - Special Wine Festival Licenses Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0132 Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 /CH0253 Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 (HB1244) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB1171/CH0672) Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM