Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0571 (SB0889/CH0570)
Title
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Historic Tome School
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1507
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Department of Parks and Recreation Project - Calvert Regional Park
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 /CH0047
Title
Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 /CH0570 (HB1060/CH0571)
Title
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 /CH0206
Title
Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0278 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 /CH0571 (SB0889/CH0570) Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority Delegate James 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Historic Tome School Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 5:00 PM
HB1507 Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Department of Parks and Recreation Project - Calvert Regional Park Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 5:00 PM
SB0243 /CH0047 Cecil County - Board of Elections - Membership Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0889 /CH0570 (HB1060/CH0571) Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation Authority Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0936 /CH0206 Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - Salary Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1035 Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line Extension Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM