Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0228 (SB0021)
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Community Colleges - Cecil College - Bachelor's Degree in Nursing
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Cecil County Farm Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 /CH0292
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259
Title
Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant Director
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1264
Title
Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 (HB0187/CH0228)
Title
Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0228 (SB0021) Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0778 Community Colleges - Cecil College - Bachelor's Degree in Nursing Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Cecil County Farm Museum Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0981 /CH0292 Cecil County - Orphans' Court - Sessions Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1219 Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1259 Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant Director Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1264 Building Performance Standards - Fire Sprinkler System Exemptions Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0021 (HB0187/CH0228) Cecil County and Queen Anne's County - Intergovernmental Cooperation and Acceptance of Funds Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM