Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Cecil County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621
Title
Cecil County Board of Education - Members - Salary
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 /CH0079 (SB0211/CH0078)
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB1047)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0640)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0708)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 /CH0312 (SB0816/CH0313)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252
Title
County Boards of Education - Disposition of School Property
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547 (SB0817/CH0531)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1653 (SB1167)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Elkton Sportsplex Campus and Performing-Visual Arts Center
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 /CH0078 (HB0629/CH0079)
Title
Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0930)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0977)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 /CH0313 (HB1201/CH0312)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB0864)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1167 (HB1653)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Elkton Sportsplex Campus and Performing-Visual Arts Center
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 Cecil County Board of Education - Members - Salary Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0629 /CH0079 (SB0211/CH0078) Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0662 Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0864 (SB1047) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 (SB0640) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 (SB0708) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1201 /CH0312 (SB0816/CH0313) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1252 County Boards of Education - Disposition of School Property Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1547 (SB0817/CH0531) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1653 (SB1167) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Elkton Sportsplex Campus and Performing-Visual Arts Center Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
SB0118 Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0211 /CH0078 (HB0629/CH0079) Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Travel Expense Allowance Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0930) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0977) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0816 /CH0313 (HB1201/CH0312) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 313
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 (HB0864) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1167 (HB1653) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Elkton Sportsplex Campus and Performing-Visual Arts Center Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM